MO HB2006 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS BILL

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

APPROPRIATIONS BILL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2006 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 98 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2006 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - House: HB 2006 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 108 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House: HB 2006 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 136 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2020-06-30HouseVetoed in Part by Governor (G)
2020-05-27HouseDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2020-05-27HouseConstitutional Objection Filed (S)
2020-05-27HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2020-05-27HouseConstitutional Objection Filed (H)
2020-05-08HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-08HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 26 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-08HouseSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 26 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-08HouseSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2020-05-08HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-08HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 107 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-08HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2020-05-07HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2020-05-07HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-07HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES SMITH, ROSS, KELLY(141), KENDRICK, PIERSON JR.
2020-05-07HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-06HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - HEGEMAN, HOUGH, CUNNINGHAM, RIZZO, ARTHUR
2020-05-06HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2020-05-06HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-06HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
2020-05-06HouseTaken Up
2020-05-05SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS
2020-05-05SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-05SenateSS Adopted (S)
2020-05-05SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2020-05-05SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-05-04SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2020-05-01SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-05-01SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-05-01SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-04-30SenateSecond read and referred: Appropriations(S)
2020-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Appropriations pending referral - Saturday, May 2, 2020, 9:30 AM, Senate Chamber
2020-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Appropriations pending referral - Friday, May 1, 2020, 9:30 AM, Senate Chamber
2020-04-29HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-04-29HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 136 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 0
2020-04-29HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-04-27HousePerfected (H)
2020-04-27HouseHS Adopted in House (H)
2020-04-27HouseTaken Up
2020-04-27HouseLaid Over (H)
2020-04-27HouseTaken Up
2020-04-27HouseLaid Over (H)
2020-04-27HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-04-27HouseHouse Substitute Offered (H)
2020-04-27HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-04-24HouseHouse Substitute Distributed
2020-03-16HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - Six hours total debate on perfection. AYES: 34 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-15HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-03-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-03-15HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-02-06HouseReferred: Budget(H)
2020-01-30HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-29HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2006&year=2020&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/2006H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/2006H.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/2006H.04P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/2006H.04F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/2006S.05C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/2006S.06F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/2006H.07S.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/2006H.07T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/052.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay490505862-885.pdf#872
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/059.012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/059.011.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/059.010.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback