MO HB20 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS BILL
Title
APPROPRIATIONS BILL
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB20&year=2021&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0020H.01I.pdf |