MO HB1993 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires a crime inquiry and inspection report for every towing where a law enforcement officer is involved, regardless of whether the towing is initiated by a law enforcement officer or requested by another party

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a crime inquiry and inspection report for every towing where a law enforcement officer is involved, regardless of whether the towing is initiated by a law enforcement officer or requested by another party

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-04-10HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-04-10HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-04-03HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-03-27HousePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
2018-03-26HouseRe-referred to Committee: General Laws(H)
2018-02-15HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2018-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback