MO HB1976 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a portion of Business 71 in McDonald County the "Army PFC Christopher Lee Marion Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates a portion of Business 71 in McDonald County the "Army PFC Christopher Lee Marion Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Rep. Dirk Deaton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1976&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3540H.01I.pdf |