MO HB1973 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to agricultural stormwater discharges
Title
Modifies provisions relating to agricultural stormwater discharges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House: HB 1973 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1973 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 38 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - House - House: HB 1973 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 38 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 23, 2018, 2:00pm, SCR 2 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-28 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 3 adopted |
2018-03-28 | House | HCS#2 Adopted (H) |
2018-03-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-07 | House | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-07 | House | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Conservation and Natural Resources AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2018-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |