MO HB1960 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Simplifies the application form for certain public assistance benefit programs and allows certain periodic eligibility review forms to be submitted as an attachment to a recipient's state tax return.
Title
Simplifies the application form for certain public assistance benefit programs and allows certain periodic eligibility review forms to be submitted as an attachment to a recipient's state tax return.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |