MO HB1960 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H)
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H)
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers all powers, duties, and functions of the Division of Water Patrol within the State Highway Patrol to the State Water Patrol within the Department of Public Safety
Title
Transfers all powers, duties, and functions of the Division of Water Patrol within the State Highway Patrol to the State Water Patrol within the Department of Public Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-01-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1960&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1960I.PDF |