MO HB1959 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopts an agreement to elect the president by national popular vote

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopts an agreement to elect the president by national popular vote

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-21HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-03-31HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2016-03-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-23HouseReferred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H)
2016-02-23HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2016-02-23HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2016-02-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-16HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-02-10HouseReferred: Elections(H)
2016-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-01-04HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback