MO HB1958 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the offense of escape or attempted escape from custody and the offense of escape or attempted escape from confinement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the offense of escape or attempted escape from custody and the offense of escape or attempted escape from confinement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-13HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2022-01-06HouseRead Second Time (H)
2022-01-05HouseRead First Time (H)
2021-12-15HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback