MO HB1956 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-25 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies construction permit requirements under the Missouri clean water act for projects involving sewage conveyance or discharge to waters of the state
Title
Modifies construction permit requirements under the Missouri clean water act for projects involving sewage conveyance or discharge to waters of the state
Sponsors
Rep. Dirk Deaton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2024-01-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-01-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-15 | House | Prefiled (H) |