MO HB195 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a court to reduce a life without parole sentence to a sentence of life with eligibility for parole in certain circumstances.
Title
Allows a court to reduce a life without parole sentence to a sentence of life with eligibility for parole in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. James Neely [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB195&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0335H.01I.pdf |