MO HB1942 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows institutions of higher education to designate one or more faculty or staff members as campus protection officers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows institutions of higher education to designate one or more faculty or staff members as campus protection officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-02-15HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-14HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-18HouseReferred: Higher Education(H)
2018-01-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-04HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback