MO HB1942 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows institutions of higher education to designate one or more faculty or staff members as campus protection officers
Title
Allows institutions of higher education to designate one or more faculty or staff members as campus protection officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2018-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |