MO HB1941 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Excludes any fantasy contest from gambling or advance gambling activity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excludes any fantasy contest from gambling or advance gambling activity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-12 - House - House: HB 1941 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 130 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: HB 1941 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 131 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House: HB 1941 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-10HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2016-06-10HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2016-05-25HouseDelivered to Governor
2016-05-25HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2016-05-25HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2016-05-13HouseHouse Message (H)
2016-05-12HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 131 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 0
2016-05-12HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 130 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 0
2016-05-12HouseTaken Up
2016-05-11HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2016-05-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2016-05-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-05-11HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2016-05-11SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS
2016-05-10SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 20 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
2016-05-10SenateSS Adopted (S) - SA 1 withdrawn
2016-05-10SenateTaken Up
2016-05-10SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SS offered
2016-05-10SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2016-05-10SenateTaken Up
2016-05-09SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2016-05-09SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2016-05-05SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - voted do pass
2016-05-04SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 5, 2016, 1:00pm, Bingham Conference Room
2016-05-03SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S)
2016-05-02SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 3, 2016, 12:30pm, Bingham Conference Room
2016-05-02SenateReferred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
2016-04-28SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2016-04-27SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2016-04-20SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2016-04-18SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 20, 2016, 2:00pm, SCR 2
2016-04-14SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Progress and Development(S)
2016-04-07HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2016-04-07HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0
2016-04-07HouseTaken Up
2016-04-05HousePerfected (H)
2016-04-05HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2016-04-05HouseTaken Up
2016-03-15HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-03-09HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2016-03-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-11HouseReferred: Select Committee on General Laws(H)
2016-02-11HouseReported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-02-10HouseVoted Do Pass with Amendments (H)
2016-02-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-03HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-01-28HouseReferred: Emerging Issues(H)
2016-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2015-12-30HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1941&year=2016&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1941I.PDF
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/commit/HB1941C.PDF
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/perf/HB1941P.PDF
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/hlrbillspdf/5525S.03C.PDF
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/hlrbillspdf/5525S.05F.PDF
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/truly/HB1941T.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/049.014.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/Journals/RDay6705101959-2095.pdf#2070
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/070.053.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/070.052.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback