MO HB1940 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires law enforcement officers to give persons under arrest forty-eight hours to arrange for their motor vehicle to be removed before authorizing a towing company to remove a motor vehicle.
Title
Requires law enforcement officers to give persons under arrest forty-eight hours to arrange for their motor vehicle to be removed before authorizing a towing company to remove a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1940&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4077H.01I.pdf |