MO HB1937 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits political subdivisions from regulating the open carry of firearms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits political subdivisions from regulating the open carry of firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-28HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-28HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-27HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-26HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2018-01-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-04HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback