MO HB1937 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits political subdivisions from regulating the open carry of firearms
Title
Prohibits political subdivisions from regulating the open carry of firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |