MO HB1936 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]


Modifies provisions relating to the concealed carrying of firearms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Modifies provisions relating to the concealed carrying of firearms



2018-02-28HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-28HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-26HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2018-01-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-04HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

Bill Comments