MO HB1934 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates "Historical Legacy Trails of Missouri"
Title
Designates "Historical Legacy Trails of Missouri"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-13 | House | Prefiled (H) |