MO HB193 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Barton County to repeal a property tax in favor of a sales tax dedicated to a hospital district
Title
Authorizes Barton County to repeal a property tax in favor of a sales tax dedicated to a hospital district
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House: HB 193 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 25, 2017, 1:00 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Local Government and Elections(S) |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 111 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-09 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-06 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-03-06 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass - Not Consent (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass - Not Consent (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-08 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |