MO HB1928 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Second read and referred: Senate Education(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Second read and referred: Senate Education(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Legislative Task Force on Dyslexia" and requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to employ a dyslexia specialist and develop professional development programs for school staff
Title
Creates the "Legislative Task Force on Dyslexia" and requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to employ a dyslexia specialist and develop professional development programs for school staff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - House - House: HB 1928 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-25 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-04-18 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, and HA 4 adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-04-18 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-22 | House | Prefiled (H) |