MO HB1922 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Department of Corrections Oversight Committee
Title
Establishes the Department of Corrections Oversight Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-09 | House | Prefiled (H) |