MO HB1909 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding aircraft fuel, liens on aircraft, and anemometer towers
Title
Changes the laws regarding aircraft fuel, liens on aircraft, and anemometer towers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-16 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 140 NOES: 0 | |
2012-05-16 | House Concurs (H) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 142 NOES: 0 | |
2012-05-16 | Reported to the House with... (S) - AS AMENDED | |
2012-05-16 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 34 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-05-16 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-16 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-05-16 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-05-15 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 16, 8:30AM, SCR 2 | |
2012-05-14 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-24 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-18 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 18, 8:00AM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2012-04-02 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 002 | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |