MO HB1907 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to working animals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to working animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-04-26HouseHCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-24HouseHCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-04-17HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-03-13HouseRe-committed to Committee: Agriculture Policy(H)
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-02-28HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2018-02-28HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-02-28HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-02-28HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-20HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-06HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-30HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Agriculture Policy(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback