MO HB1907 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the rate of tuition that a receiving school district can charge when receiving students from unaccredited districts
Title
Limits the rate of tuition that a receiving school district can charge when receiving students from unaccredited districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1907&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1907I.htm |