MO HB1907 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding vulnerable persons, child abuse and neglect, and the crime of domestic assault

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding vulnerable persons, child abuse and neglect, and the crime of domestic assault

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-02 Voted Do Pass (H)
2012-05-02 Executive Session Completed (H)
2012-05-02 Public Hearing Completed (H)
2012-04-18 Referred: Children and Families (H)
2012-03-08 Read Second Time (H)
2012-03-07 Introduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback