MO HB1903 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows school districts that share superintendents to receive additional state aid.
Title
Allows school districts that share superintendents to receive additional state aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 1903 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 144 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 12:00 pm, Tuesday, April 28, 2020, Joint Committee Room |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled (H) |