MO HB1903 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-15 - Veto Override Failed (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-15 - Veto Override Failed (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Federal Budget Stabilization Extension Fund and the Race to the Top Fund to receive moneys from any legislation enacted by the 111th United States Congress
Title
Creates the Federal Budget Stabilization Extension Fund and the Race to the Top Fund to receive moneys from any legislation enacted by the 111th United States Congress
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Icet [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-15 | Veto Override Failed (G) | |
2010-09-15 | Veto Override Failed (G) | |
2010-07-14 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-14 | Vetoed by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-14 | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 | |
2010-05-14 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 3 | |
2010-05-14 | House Concurs (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 151 NOES: 3 | |
2010-04-28 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS | |
2010-04-28 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-04-28 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-04-28 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-28 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-04-22 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-21 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-03-18 | Second Read and Referred: Appropriations (S) | |
2010-03-04 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-04 | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Perfected (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-03 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-24 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-24 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Public Hearing Continued (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred: Budget (H) | |
2010-02-02 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |