MO HB1900 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to licensure based on work experience in another jurisdiction
Title
Modifies provisions relating to licensure based on work experience in another jurisdiction
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Grier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-09 | House | Prefiled (H) |