MO HB190 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the provision regulating capitol parking garages.
Title
Modifies the provision regulating capitol parking garages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-05-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB190&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0220H.01I.pdf |