MO HB19 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Budget Committee
Hearing: Apr 24 @ 8:15 am in House Hearing Room 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To appropriate money for purposes for the several departments and offices of state government; for planning and capital improvements including but not limited to major additions and renovations, new structures, and land improvements or acquisitions; to be expended only as provided in Article IV, Section 28 of the Constitution of Missouri, from the funds herein designated for the fiscal period beginning July 1, 2019 and ending June 30, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To appropriate money for purposes for the several departments and offices of state government; for planning and capital improvements including but not limited to major additions and renovations, new structures, and land improvements or acquisitions; to be expended only as provided in Article IV, Section 28 of the Constitution of Missouri, from the funds herein designated for the fiscal period beginning July 1, 2019 and ending June 30, 2020.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-03-12HouseReferred: Budget(H)
2019-02-14HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback