MO HB1894 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding mental health services
Title
Changes the laws regarding mental health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-07 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-14 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 0 | |
2010-05-14 | House Concurs (H) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 153 NOES: 0 | |
2010-05-06 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SA 1, SA 2 | |
2010-05-06 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-06 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-06 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-05-06 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-05-06 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-05-05 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 6, 2010, 8:00A.M.SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2010-04-27 | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S) | |
2010-04-27 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-04-22 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-13 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT | |
2010-04-13 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S) | |
2010-04-06 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Referred: Judiciary (H) | |
2010-02-02 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |