MO HB1892 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies residency requirements for deputy sheriffs
Title
Modifies residency requirements for deputy sheriffs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House: HB 1892 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 126 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 5, 2018, 8:15am, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-08 | House | Taken Up |
2018-03-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-03-06 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |