MO HB1892 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain specified individuals in addition to the school superintendent to issue a student work certificate
Title
Authorizes certain specified individuals in addition to the school superintendent to issue a student work certificate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 4 | |
2010-05-13 | House Concurs (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 145 NOES: 3 | |
2010-04-28 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS | |
2010-04-28 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-04-28 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2010-04-15 | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-07 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-06 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 7, 2010, 1:30P.M.,SENATE LOUNGE | |
2010-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Education (S) | |
2010-03-30 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-24 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-11 | Refer: Spec Stand Com on Workforce Dev & Workplace Safety(H) | |
2010-02-02 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |