MO HB1891 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds that the officer of the court or peace officer a person reports to if released before a trial to be an employee of the state or a political subdivision of the state
Title
Adds that the officer of the court or peace officer a person reports to if released before a trial to be an employee of the state or a political subdivision of the state
Sponsors
Rep. Wes Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: Public Safety(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |