MO HB1882 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits children from being placed in the custody of individuals who have been found guilty of the offense of sexual trafficking of a child in the first degree.
Title
Prohibits children from being placed in the custody of individuals who have been found guilty of the offense of sexual trafficking of a child in the first degree.
Sponsors
Rep. Nate Tate [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1882&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4391H.01I.pdf |