MO HB1882 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires scrap metal dealers to keep documentation relating to the purchase of certain recycled batteries
Title
Requires scrap metal dealers to keep documentation relating to the purchase of certain recycled batteries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1882&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4045H.01I.pdf |