MO HB1873 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the offense of vehicle hijacking

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the offense of vehicle hijacking

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: HB 1873 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 123 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-04SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-05-04SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-05-04SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-04-30SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 4, 2020, 1:00 PM, Senate Chamber
2020-03-12SenateSecond read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2020-02-24HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-02-24HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-24HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-02-24HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-24HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-20HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-02-19HousePerfected (H)
2020-02-19HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-02-19HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-02-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-29HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-01-29HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-21HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-23HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback