MO HB1873 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the offense of vehicle hijacking.
Title
Creates the offense of vehicle hijacking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: HB 1873 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 123 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 4, 2020, 1:00 PM, Senate Chamber |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-19 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled (H) |