MO HB1872 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of unlawful merchandising practices by excluding certain contracts for residences from the law.
Title
Modifies provisions of unlawful merchandising practices by excluding certain contracts for residences from the law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1872&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4269H.01I.pdf |