MO HB1870 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain medications in multidose containers used by a patient during a hospital stay to be sent with the patient at discharge
Title
Allows certain medications in multidose containers used by a patient during a hospital stay to be sent with the patient at discharge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Placed Back on Perfection Calendar |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |