MO HB1866 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes several highway and bridge designations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes several highway and bridge designations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-07HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-07-07HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-05-13HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-12HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 141 PRESENT: 1
2014-05-12HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 141 PRESENT: 1
2014-05-12HouseTaken Up
2014-05-07SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS
2014-05-07SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32
2014-05-07SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2014-05-07SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-05-07SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2014-05-01SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2014-05-01SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2014-04-30SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 1, 2014, 9:45AM, PERSHING GALLERY
2014-04-23SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2014-04-22SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 23, 2014, 8:00am, Senate Committee Room 1
2014-04-03SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S)
2014-04-01HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-31HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151
2014-03-31HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-27HousePerfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-11HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-03-11HouseReported Do Pass by Consent (H)
2014-03-11HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2014-03-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-02-25HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2014-02-17HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-02-13HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback