MO HB1865 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that lawful owners of firearms may transport or store the firearms in locked, privately-owned motor vehicles
Title
Specifies that lawful owners of firearms may transport or store the firearms in locked, privately-owned motor vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1865&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4747H.01I.pdf |