MO HB1865 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tax credit for the establishment of full-service grocery stores in food deserts
Title
Authorizes a tax credit for the establishment of full-service grocery stores in food deserts
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Dunn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-12 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-04-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-16 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1865&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1865I.PDF |