MO HB1859 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes naming requirements for ballot measures
Title
Imposes naming requirements for ballot measures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1859 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: HB 1859 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House: HB 1859 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-25 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-14 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, adopted. |
2022-04-14 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2022-04-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-21 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |