MO HB1859 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows law enforcement agencies to assist other law enforcement agencies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows law enforcement agencies to assist other law enforcement agencies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - House - House: HB 1859 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-03-08SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-06SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 8, 2018, 8:15am, Senate Lounge
2018-02-21SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
2018-02-12HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-12HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-12HouseTaken Up
2018-02-07HousePerfected (H)
2018-02-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-02-07HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-01HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-31HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-30HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-01-30HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-30HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-17HouseReferred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback