MO HB1859 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows law enforcement agencies to assist other law enforcement agencies
Title
Allows law enforcement agencies to assist other law enforcement agencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House: HB 1859 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 8, 2018, 8:15am, Senate Lounge |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2018-02-12 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-12 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-07 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-07 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |