MO HB1855 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-12 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to civil liability for publishing or distributing material harmful to minors on the internet
Title
Establishes provisions relating to civil liability for publishing or distributing material harmful to minors on the internet
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1 |
2024-03-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |