MO HB1851 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the "German Heritage Corridor of Missouri"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates the "German Heritage Corridor of Missouri"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 1851 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 128 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 1851 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House: HB 1851 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-01HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2016-07-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2016-05-25HouseDelivered to Governor
2016-05-25HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2016-05-25HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2016-05-13HouseHouse Message (H)
2016-05-13HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 137 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 1
2016-05-13HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 128 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 0
2016-05-13HouseTaken Up
2016-05-13HouseLaid Over (H)
2016-05-13HouseTaken Up
2016-05-13HouseLaid Over (H)
2016-05-13HouseTaken Up
2016-05-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-05-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2016-05-09HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2016-05-09SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS
2016-05-09SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-05-09SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2016-05-09SenateTaken Up
2016-04-14SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2016-04-13SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass Consent
2016-04-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2016-04-08SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 13, 2016, 8:15 a.m., SCR 1
2016-03-31SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S)
2016-03-16HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2016-03-15HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0
2016-03-15HouseTaken Up
2016-03-07HousePerfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2016-02-18HouseRules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-02-17HouseRules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2016-02-17HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-04HouseReferred: Select Committee on Rules(H)
2016-02-04HouseReported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2016-02-03HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2016-02-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-01-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-01-12HouseReferred: Trade and Tourism(H)
2016-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2015-12-15HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback