MO HB1849 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applies the offense of unlawful possession of firearms to certain additional categories of individuals in possession of firearms
Title
Applies the offense of unlawful possession of firearms to certain additional categories of individuals in possession of firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1849&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4668H.02I.pdf |